spielautomat für touch-pc? | Corel Digital Studio 2010 Multilingual. | Garo Divine Flame Movie (1)
 Examples for business, study, careers, love, and more...
Examples :: Math :: Example of Easy Multiplication

Popular Examples

More Math

See all Math
report this ad

Example of Multiplication

Multiplying by 10

Multiply any number by 10 is easy, simply multiply by 1 and add Zero at the end OR move the decimal point one space to the right. For example, 83.45 * 10 = 834.5

  • 10 * 1 is 10
  • 10 * 2 is 20
  • 10 * 3 is 30
  • 10 * 4 is 40
  • 10 * 5 is 50
  • 10 * 6 is 60
  • 10 * 7 is 70
  • 10 * 8 is 80
  • 10 * 9 is 90
  • 10 * 10 is 10
  • 10 * 11 is 110
  • 10 * 12 is 120

Multiplying by 100

To multiply a number by 100 is easy, just add 00 after the number OR move the decimal point to two spaces right 789.568 * 100 =78956.8

  • 100 * 1 is 100
  • 100 * 2 is 200
  • 100 * 3 is 300
  • 100 * 4 is 400
  • 100 * 5 is 500
  • 100 * 6 is 600
  • 100 * 7 is 700
  • 100 * 8 is 800
  • 100 * 9 is 900
  • 100 * 10 is 100
  • 100 * 11 is 1100
  • 100 * 12 is 1200

Multiplying two digit by one digit numbers

  • First line up the numbers as per the place value (all the tens and the units lined up vertically). Put a line under the last number.
  • 52
     3
    
  • Multiply the numbers in ones place (2 * 3 = 6). Write the answer in the ones place column.
  • 52
     3
     6
    
  • Multiply the number in the tens place column (5) by the number in the lower ones place column (3). The answer is 5 * 3 = 15. Write the answer below the line in the tens place column.
  •  52
      3
    156

Multiplying two digit by one digit numbers

How to multiply a two-digit number by a one-digit number?

  • First line up the numbers as per the place value (all the tens and the units lined up vertically). Put a line under the last number.
  • 78
     5
    
  • Multiply the two ones digit numbers (8 * 5 = 40). This result is greater than 9, so write the 4 above the tens place value and write the 0 under the line in the ones place column.
  • 4
    78
     5
     0
    
  • Multiply the digit in the tens place column (7) by the lower ones place digit (5). The result is 7 * 5 = 35. Add 4 to 35 (35 + 4 = 39) and write the answer under the line and to the left of the 3.
  •  4
     78
      5
    390
    

Multiplication of Two and Three Digit Numbers

How to multiply a three-digit number by a two-digit number (e.g. 649 * 76)?

  • First line up the numbers as per the place value (all the hundreds, tens and the ones lined up vertically). Draw a line under the last number.
  • 649
     76
    
  • Multiply the numbers in ones place. (9 * 6 = 54). The result 54 is greater than 9 so write a 5 above the tens place value and write 4 under the line in the ones place column
  •   5
     649
      76
       4
    
  • Multiply the digit in the tens place column that is 4 by the number in the lower ones place column that is 6. The result is (4*6=24). Now Add 5 to 24 (24 + 5 = 29) and write 9 in the tens place column below the line and 2 above the hundreds place column.
  •  25
     649
      76
      94
    
  • Multiply the digit in the hundreds place column (6) by the number in the lower ones place column (6). The result is (6*6=36). Now Add 2 to 36 (36 + 2 = 38) and write 38 under the line to the left of 9.
  •  25
     649
      76
    3894
    
  • After 649 has been multiplied by 6 as shown above, 649 is multiplied by the number in the lower tens'' place, which is 7. The number is shifted one place to the left because we are multiplying by a tens' place value. The result will be 4543:
  •    25
       649
        76
      3894
     4543
    
  • Draw a line under the lower product (4543) and the products are now added together to get the final result of 49324.
  •    25
       649
        76
      3894
     4543 
     49324
    

Multiplying three digit by one digit numbers

How to multiply a three-digit number by a one-digit number (e.g. 524 * 2)?

  • First line up the numbers as per the place value (all the tens and the units lined up vertically). Put a line under the last number.
  • 524
      2
    
  • Multiply the numbers in the ones place (4 * 2 = 8). Write the 8 under the line in the ones place column.
  • 524
      2
      8
    
  • Multiply the number in the tens place column that is 2 by the number in the lower ones place number that is 2. The result is 2 * 2 = 4. Write the answer under the line and to the left of the 8.
  • 524
      2
     48
    
  • Multiply the number in the hundreds place column that is 5 by the lower tens place number which is 2. The result is 5 * 2 = 10. Write the 10 under the line in the hundreds'' place column.
  •  524
       2
    1048
    

Multiplication facts for 0, 1, 2 and 3

If any number is multiplied by 0, answer is 0.

If any number is multiplied by 1, answer is that number.

Multiplying by 2 and 3
TWO
 0*2=0  1*2=2  2*2=4  3*2=6  4*2=8
THREE
 0*3=0  1*3=3  2*3=6  3*3=9  4*3=12
Multiplication using a Calculator

How to multiply two numbers (for example 46 * 78) with a calculator?

  • Type the first number by pressing the 4 button and the 6 button.
  • Press the * operation button.
  • Type the number 78 by pressing the 7 button and the 8 button.
  • Press the = button to get the result.

Try some yourself:

Exercise 1

  1. 143 * 8 =
  2. 434 * 233 =
  3. 767 * 5 =
  4. 555 * 245 =
  5. 7878 * 98 =
  6. 6578 * 10 =
  7. 56 * 5 =
  8. 2323 * 57 =
  9. 888 * 321 =
  10. 567 * 38 =

Answers to exercise 1

  1. 1144
  2. 101122
  3. 3835
  4. 135975
  5. 772044
  6. 65780
  7. 280
  8. 132411
  9. 285048
  10. 21546